Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/17/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/20/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/25/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/25/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/25/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/27/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 09/11/2013