Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/17/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/08/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/22/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 11/20/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/03/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/04/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/09/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/11/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/11/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 02/04/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/13/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/08/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/22/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/22/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/09/2014