Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/14/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/28/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/11/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/11/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 10/22/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 11/20/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/05/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 03/05/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 03/06/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/06/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/12/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/12/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/12/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/12/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/13/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 03/13/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/13/2014
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/13/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/14/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 03/14/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/14/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 03/14/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/27/2014
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 04/04/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/08/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/08/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 04/08/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/08/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/28/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/29/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/29/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/29/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/29/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/29/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 05/29/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/09/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/19/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew