Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 06/18/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 12/05/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 11/12/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/12/2014