Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/10/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/23/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/31/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 09/11/2014