Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/20/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/06/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/17/2014