Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/19/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/25/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/25/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/08/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/08/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/09/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/22/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 09/17/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 10/04/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 11/19/2013