Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 06/14/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/17/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 08/01/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/04/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 02/04/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/04/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/04/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/04/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/04/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 02/04/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 02/04/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/04/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 02/27/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/27/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/10/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/10/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 04/10/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 04/10/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 05/07/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/07/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/07/2014