Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 01/23/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 02/08/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 02/08/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 02/13/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/13/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/13/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 02/14/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/14/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/25/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/25/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/28/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/07/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 03/12/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/23/2013