Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/17/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 06/17/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/17/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 06/28/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/28/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/28/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/09/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/10/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/15/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/16/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/29/2014