Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/18/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/19/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/20/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/24/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 07/24/2013