Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/28/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/28/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/08/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/16/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/18/2013