Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/19/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 07/23/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/28/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/04/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/05/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 03/05/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 03/05/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/12/2014