Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/26/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 07/18/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/23/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/30/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/31/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 08/02/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 08/02/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 09/09/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/09/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/09/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/09/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/11/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/18/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/18/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/18/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/28/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/28/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/28/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/28/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/28/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 09/28/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/28/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/28/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 09/28/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 09/28/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 10/10/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/10/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 10/22/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 10/22/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/22/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 10/23/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 11/21/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/09/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/11/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 01/08/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/08/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 02/14/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/24/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/01/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/01/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/01/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/07/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/07/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/09/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/01/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/01/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/01/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/01/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/01/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/08/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/08/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/09/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/19/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 05/19/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/19/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/21/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/30/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/11/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/12/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/17/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 06/24/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/24/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 07/08/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/08/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/11/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/31/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/31/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/08/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/08/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/11/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/15/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 11/12/2014