There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Community Parks Revitalization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of Housing and Urban development to establish a program enabling communities to better leverage resources to address health, economic development, and conservation concerns through needed investments in parks, recreational areas, facilities, and programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/18/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
07/17/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4532)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/08/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
06/24/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/18/2013Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/18/2013Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/18/2013Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/18/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/09/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/09/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/09/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/19/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/19/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/19/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/11/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/11/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/11/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/11/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/11/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/05/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 01/14/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 02/10/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/26/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 12/04/2014

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services06/18/2013 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce06/18/2013 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training07/08/2013 Referred to
House Natural Resources06/18/2013 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation06/24/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2424. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/18/2013)

Community Parks Revitalization Act - Requires the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) to carry out a community revitalization program of federal grants to eligible local governments located within standard metropolitan statistical areas for various park and recreation purposes, including grants for rehabilitation and construction, innovation and recreation programming, and recovery action programs.

Authorizes the Secretary to designate local governments not located in standard metropolitan statistical areas to receive such grants under a partial eligibility waiver.

Prescribes requirements, including matching requirements, for rehabilitation and construction and for innovation and recreation grants.

Limits to 10% the use of funds appropriated for rehabilitation and construction grants for acquisition of land or interests in land.

Allows a recipient, at its discretion, to transfer a grant in whole or in part to private nonprofit agencies for recreational areas and facilities they own or operate which offer recreational opportunities to the general population.

Requires an applicant, for project approval, to submit to the Secretary evidence of its commitment to ongoing planning, rehabilitation, service, operation, and maintenance programs for its park and recreation systems, expressed in a five-year local park and recreation recovery action program.

Prescribes requirements for the five-year park and recreation recovery action program under an at-risk youth recreation grant.

Authorizes the Secretary to increase federal rehabilitation and construction, innovation, and at-risk youth recreation grants to a state under this Act by an additional match of up to 15% (but not more than 15%) of total project or program cost. Limits the aggregate amount of the grant and the additional grant amounts to 85% percent of total project or program cost.

Prohibits the conversion, without HUD approval, of any property improved or developed with assistance under this Act for uses other than for public recreation.