Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/09/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/09/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/09/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/19/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/19/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/19/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/11/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/11/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/11/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/11/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/11/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/05/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 01/14/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 02/10/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/26/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 12/04/2014