Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 06/19/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/19/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 11/14/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/12/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/29/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 04/03/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/10/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew