Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 06/19/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/11/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 07/15/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/19/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 10/29/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/24/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew