Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 06/19/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/20/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/25/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/11/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/18/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/25/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/13/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/13/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/01/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew