Refine your search

Refined by:

Tennessee Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/19/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/20/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/09/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/11/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/24/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew