Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
03/06/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-86.
03/06/2014 Signed by President.
02/27/2014 Presented to President.
02/25/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1132)
02/10/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 365 - 21 (Roll no. 55).(text: CR H1691)
02/06/2014 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 113-348.
06/19/2013 Introduced in House