Refine your search

19 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
03/06/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-86.
03/06/2014 Signed by President.
02/27/2014 House Presented to President.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/26/2014 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
02/25/2014 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1132)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
02/11/2014 Senate Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 307.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: Senate
02/10/2014-6:59pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 365 - 21 (Roll no. 55). (text: CR H1691)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/2014-6:27pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1697-1698)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/2014-5:50pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/2014-5:36pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2431.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/2014-5:36pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1691-1693)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/2014-5:36pm House Mr. Hall moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2014 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 258.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2014 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 113-348.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Science, Space, and Technology
12/05/2013 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Science, Space, and Technology
12/05/2013 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Science, Space, and Technology
09/24/2013 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Science, Space, and Technology
06/19/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
06/19/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives