Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/10/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/10/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/10/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/10/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/10/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/11/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/11/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/11/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/16/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/17/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/19/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/19/2013