Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/25/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/25/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 06/26/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/26/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/26/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 06/27/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/28/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/23/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/17/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 11/19/2013