There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the President to extend the term of the Agreement for Cooperation between the Government of the United States of America and the Government of the Republic of Korea Concerning Civil Uses of Nuclear Energy for a period not to exceed March 19, 2016.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/17/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 461).(text: CR H5562)
09/17/2013Reported by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 113-209.
06/20/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
09/18/2013SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
09/17/2013-7:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 461). (text: CR H5562)
09/17/2013-6:57pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5573-5574)
09/17/2013-4:59pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/17/2013-4:40pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2449.
09/17/2013-4:40pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5562-5564)
09/17/2013-4:40pmHouseMr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/17/2013HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 153.
09/17/2013HouseReported by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 113-209.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
07/24/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
07/24/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/20/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
06/20/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/25/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/25/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/09/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/10/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/11/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/15/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 07/15/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/16/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/16/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/16/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/17/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 07/18/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 07/18/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 07/18/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 07/18/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/18/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/18/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/22/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 07/22/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/22/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/23/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/23/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/23/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/24/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs06/20/2013 Referred to
07/24/2013 Markup by
09/17/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-209
Senate Foreign Relations09/18/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2449.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2449. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/17/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the President to extend the term of the Agreement for Cooperation between the Government of the United States of America and the Government of the Republic of Korea Concerning Civil Uses of Nuclear Energy for a period not to exceed March 19, 2016.