Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/25/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/25/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/15/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/24/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/24/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/25/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/25/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/10/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/11/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 01/07/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 01/07/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/06/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/01/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/20/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/28/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 05/28/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 05/29/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/29/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/29/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/29/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/29/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/29/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/29/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/29/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/29/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/29/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 05/29/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 05/29/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/29/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/29/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/29/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/30/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 06/09/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/09/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/09/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 06/09/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/09/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/09/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/09/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/09/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/09/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/10/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 06/10/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/10/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/10/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/12/2014
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/12/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/12/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/12/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/12/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 06/12/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/18/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/18/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 06/18/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/18/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/18/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/18/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/19/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/19/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 06/20/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 06/23/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/23/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 06/24/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/24/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/25/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/25/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/25/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/25/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/26/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/26/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 06/26/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 07/08/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/08/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/09/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/09/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 07/09/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/11/2014
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 07/11/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/11/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/14/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/14/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/15/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/15/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/15/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 07/15/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/16/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/16/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/17/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/17/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/17/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/17/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/17/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 07/17/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/22/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/22/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/23/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 07/25/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/11/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 09/16/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 09/16/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/18/2014