Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/25/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/25/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/29/2014