Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 08/01/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 12/04/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/28/2014