Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/03/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/21/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/02/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 09/09/2014