Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/18/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/12/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/17/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/22/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/25/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/23/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/11/2014