Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 06/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/26/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/28/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/28/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/10/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/10/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/26/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/26/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/26/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/28/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/15/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/14/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/18/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 01/09/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/25/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/09/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/09/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/09/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/15/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/16/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/17/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/09/2014