Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/10/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 09/11/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/15/2014