Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/28/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 12/04/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/04/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/03/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/08/2014