Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 06/25/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/08/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/15/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/22/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/25/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/25/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/09/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/08/2014