Text: H.R.2497 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/25/2013)


113th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 2497

To modify the boundary of the Casa Grande Ruins National Monument, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
June 25, 2013

Mrs. Kirkpatrick (for herself, Mr. Gosar, Mr. Pastor of Arizona, and Mr. Grijalva) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Natural Resources


A BILL

To modify the boundary of the Casa Grande Ruins National Monument, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Casa Grande Ruins National Monument Boundary Modification Act of 2013”.

SEC. 2. Findings.

Congress finds the following:

(1) Casa Grande Ruin Reservation was set aside on March 2, 1889, proclaimed as the Nation's first archeological preserve on June 22, 1892, and redesignated as Casa Grande Ruins National Monument on August 3, 1918.

(2) Casa Grande Ruins National Monument protects one of the finest architectural examples of 13th Century Hohokam culture in the American Southwest known to early Spanish explorers as the “Great House”.

(3) Casa Grande is only part of the story of this ancient town that may have covered 2 square miles.

(4) Recent surveys and research have determined that the area of the Great House and the village surrounding it extends beyond the current monument boundary.

SEC. 3. Definitions.

In this Act:

(1) MAP.—The term “map” means the map entitled “Proposed Casa Grande Ruins Boundary Modification”, numbered 303/100,934, and dated January 2010.

(2) MONUMENT.—The term “Monument” means the Casa Grande Ruins National Monument in the State of Arizona.

(3) SECRETARY.—The term “Secretary” means the Secretary of the Interior.

(4) STATE.—The term “State” means the State of Arizona.

SEC. 4. Acquisition and transfer of administrative jurisdiction of lands.

(a) Acquisition of lands.—The Secretary is authorized to acquire by donation, exchange, or purchase with donated or appropriate funds from willing owners only, the private or State lands or interests in lands generally depicted on the map, to be administered as part of the Monument.

(b) Transfer of administrative jurisdiction to the NPS.—The following Federal lands as generally depicted on the map are hereby withdrawn from all forms of entry, appropriation, and disposal under the public land laws; location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and operation of the mineral leasing and geothermal leasing laws and mineral materials laws, and administrative jurisdiction of such Federal lands is hereby transferred to the National Park Service to be administered as part of the Monument:

(1) The approximately 3.8 acres of Federal land administered by the Bureau of Land Management.

(2) The approximately 7.41 acres of Federal land of administered by the Bureau of Indian Affairs.

(c) Transfer of administrative jurisdiction to BIA.—Administrative jurisdiction of the approximately 3.5 acres of Federal land administered by the National Park Service as generally depicted on the map as “Lands to be Transferred to BIA” are hereby transferred to the Bureau of Indian Affairs for the purposes of the San Carlos Irrigation Project.

(d) Administration.—Upon acquisition or transfer of the lands identified in subsections (a) and (b), the Secretary shall administer those lands as part of the Monument in accordance with the laws generally applicable to units of the National Park System, including—

(1) the National Park Service Organic Act (16 U.S.C. 1 et seq.); and

(2) the Act of August 21, 1935 (16 U.S.C. 461 et seq.).

(e) Boundary and map update.—

(1) TRANSFERS.—Upon completion of the transfers pursuant to subsection (b), the Secretary shall modify the boundary of the Monument accordingly, and shall update the map to reflect such transfers.

(2) ACQUISITIONS.—Upon completion of any of the acquisitions pursuant to subsection (a), the Secretary shall modify the boundary of the Monument accordingly, and shall update the map to reflect such acquisitions.

(f) Map on file.—The map shall be on file and available for inspection in the appropriate offices of the National Park Service, U.S. Department of the Interior.

(g) Compensation.—As consideration for the acquisition of State and private lands or interests in lands, unless such lands and interests in lands are donated, the Secretary shall—

(1) pay fair market value for such lands; or

(2) convey to the State of Arizona and private land owners, as the case may be, Federal lands, interest in Federal land, or any other Federal asset of equal value located in the State of Arizona.

SEC. 5. Administration of State trust lands.

The Secretary may enter into an agreement with the State to provide for cooperative management of the approximately 200 acres of State trust lands generally depicted on the map.