Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 09/17/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/14/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/14/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/14/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/14/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 11/14/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 11/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 11/18/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/18/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/21/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 12/19/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 02/11/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/12/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/12/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/18/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/21/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 03/26/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/02/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/02/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/04/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/02/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/28/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/09/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/18/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/12/2014