Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 06/25/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/04/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 05/08/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/08/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/18/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 11/18/2014