Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/04/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/18/2014