Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/18/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/30/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 11/12/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/04/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/26/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 09/15/2014