There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Renewable Energy Parity Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the energy credit for certain property under construction.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/25/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/25/2013Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (111)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/23/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/23/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/30/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/30/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/30/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/30/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/30/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/30/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 08/02/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 08/02/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 08/02/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/09/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/09/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/09/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 09/12/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 09/16/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 09/16/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 09/17/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/17/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/17/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/18/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 09/19/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/20/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 09/20/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/26/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/26/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 09/27/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/01/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/01/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 10/01/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/09/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/11/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/15/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/23/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/23/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/23/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/23/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 10/23/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/23/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 10/23/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/30/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 10/30/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/30/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 11/12/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 11/12/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 11/12/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/12/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 11/18/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 11/18/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/18/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/18/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/18/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/22/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/02/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/02/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/09/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 12/09/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/09/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 12/12/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/12/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/14/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 01/14/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/16/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/16/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/16/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 01/16/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 01/27/2014
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 02/06/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/29/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/17/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/20/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/08/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/10/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/20/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/16/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/25/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2502. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/25/2013)

Renewable Energy Parity Act of 2013 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend the energy tax credit to solar energy, fuel cell, microturbine, combined heat and power system, small wind energy, and thermal energy properties the construction of which begins before January 1, 2017.