Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/25/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/22/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/22/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/10/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/29/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/29/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/20/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/03/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/11/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 08/01/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 09/16/2014