Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/23/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/30/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/04/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/02/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/11/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/30/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/18/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 11/18/2014