Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 06/26/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/14/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/04/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 05/29/2014