Refine your search

Refined by:

Minnesota Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/17/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 12/09/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/28/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/14/2014