Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/29/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/15/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/04/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/10/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/03/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/30/2014