Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/29/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/20/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/20/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/10/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/16/2014