Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/23/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/10/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/02/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/12/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/30/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/16/2014