Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/30/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/21/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/12/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/04/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/02/2015