Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/26/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/02/2014
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/12/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/30/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 09/10/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/18/2014