Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 06/26/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 06/26/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/27/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/02/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/09/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/17/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 09/17/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/23/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/25/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/26/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/30/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/30/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/01/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/22/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/22/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/22/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 10/22/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 10/22/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/22/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/29/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/29/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/29/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/29/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/29/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/15/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/15/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/15/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/15/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/15/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/21/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 12/09/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/09/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 12/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/12/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/10/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/28/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/28/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/14/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 03/14/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/14/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/14/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/04/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/04/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 04/04/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/04/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/04/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/10/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/10/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/02/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/02/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/02/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/02/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/29/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/29/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 05/29/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/29/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/29/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 05/29/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/12/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/12/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/20/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/20/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/20/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/20/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/03/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/03/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/11/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/30/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/30/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 08/01/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/10/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/10/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 09/16/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/18/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 11/18/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/18/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/18/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 01/02/2015
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/02/2015